10/14/2009 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2528.) | |||
09/12/2009 | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 26. Noes 2. Page 2452.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Ducheny. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2452.) | |||
09/08/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
09/04/2009 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |||
08/31/2009 | From inactive file. To second reading. | |||
08/20/2009 | To inactive file on motion of Senator Ducheny. | |||
06/11/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |||
05/14/2009 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/04/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/04/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 1226.) | |||
03/31/2009 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
02/03/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | |||
02/02/2009 | Read first time. To print. |