07/23/2010 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
07/12/2010 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:15 a.m. | |||
07/01/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
07/01/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4198.) | |||
06/24/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/23/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23). | |||
05/27/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/13/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 5148.) | |||
04/28/2010 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
04/27/2010 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 21). | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/17/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |||
02/16/2010 | Read first time. To print. |