|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 67. Noes 8. Page 6156.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4408.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 8. Page 5404.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|