09/23/2010 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
09/07/2010 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 12 p.m. | |||
08/24/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/24/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 4847.) | |||
06/10/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/09/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |||
05/27/2010 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
05/13/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 5165.) | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 5). | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
02/17/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |||
02/16/2010 | Read first time. To print. |