|
06/15/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 4982.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|