|
06/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 32, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 4089.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 16). Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3917.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5649.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5628.).
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|