|
10/14/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2527.)
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 25. Noes 0. Page 2452.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Ducheny. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2453.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2280.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Ducheny.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 1226.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|