California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB189 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 10/26/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 189ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE OCTOBER 14, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY OCTOBER 26, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 8, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Budget (Evans (Chair), Arambula, Beall, Blumenfield, Brownley, Caballero, Carter, De La Torre, Feuer, Hill, Huffman, Monning, Ruskin, and Swanson) FEBRUARY 2, 2009 An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 5924 of the Government Code, relating to state finances, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 189, Committee on Budget. Budget Act of 2009. Existing law sets forth the duties and authority of the Treasurer generally in the sale of state bonds. Moneys are continuously appropriated from the General Fund in an annual amount necessary to pay all obligations, including principal, interest, fees, costs, indemnities, and all other amounts incurred by the state under or in connection with any credit enhancement or liquidity agreement entered into by the state, as specified, for bonds payable pursuant to an appropriation from the General Fund. Existing law prohibits the amount appropriated for these fees, costs, and other similar expenses from exceeding a percentage of the original principal amount of the bonds that is specified in the federal Internal Revenue Code. This bill would, until June 30, 2013, instead increase that percentage by which those expenses are calculated to 3%, thereby making an appropriation. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5924 of the Government Code is amended to read: 5924. (a) (1) Notwithstanding Section 13340, there is hereby continuously appropriated without regard to fiscal years, from the General Fund in the State Treasury for the purpose of this chapter, an amount that will equal the sum annually as will be necessary to pay all obligations, including principal, interest, fees, costs, indemnities, and all other amounts incurred by the state under or in connection with any credit enhancement or liquidity agreement, as specified in paragraph (2), that is entered into by the state pursuant to this chapter for bonds payable pursuant to an appropriation from the General Fund. (2) A credit enhancement or liquidity agreement subject to this section includes a credit enhancement or liquidity agreement that is in the form of a letter of credit, standby purchase agreement, reimbursement agreement, liquidity facility, or other similar arrangement. (b) (1) If the agent for sale determines that the credit enhancement or liquidity agreement is expected to result in a lower cost of the borrowing for the bonds to which the credit enhancement or liquidity agreement pertains, the state may incur fees, costs, and other similar expenses under or in connection with any credit enhancement or liquidity agreement entered into by the state pursuant to this chapter. (2) The amount appropriated pursuant to subdivision (a) for fees, costs, and other similar expenses incurred in connection with any credit enhancement or liquidity agreement, when expressed as a percentage of the original principal amount of the bonds to which the credit enhancement or liquidity agreement pertains, may not exceed 3 percent. (3) The amount appropriated pursuant to subdivision (a) for interest incurred in connection with any credit enhancement or liquidity agreement, when expressed as a percentage of the outstanding principal amount of the bonds to which the credit enhancement or liquidity agreement pertains, may not exceed the interest rate percentage set forth in subdivision (d) of Section 16731. (c) This section shall become inoperative on June 30, 2013, and, as of January 1, 2014, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2014, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 5924 is added to the Government Code, to read: 5924. (a) (1) Notwithstanding Section 13340, there is hereby continuously appropriated without regard to fiscal years, from the General Fund in the State Treasury for the purpose of this chapter, an amount that will equal the sum annually as will be necessary to pay all obligations, including principal, interest, fees, costs, indemnities, and all other amounts incurred by the state under or in connection with any credit enhancement or liquidity agreement, as specified in paragraph (2), that is entered into by the state pursuant to this chapter for bonds payable pursuant to an appropriation from the General Fund. (2) A credit enhancement or liquidity agreement subject to this section includes a credit enhancement or liquidity agreement that is in the form of a letter of credit, standby purchase agreement, reimbursement agreement, liquidity facility, or other similar arrangement. (b) (1) If the agent for sale determines that the credit enhancement or liquidity agreement is expected to result in a lower cost of the borrowing for the bonds to which the credit enhancement or liquidity agreement pertains, the state may incur fees, costs, and other similar expenses under or in connection with any credit enhancement or liquidity agreement entered into by the state pursuant to this chapter. (2) The amount appropriated pursuant to subdivision (a) for fees, costs, and other similar expenses incurred in connection with any credit enhancement or liquidity agreement, when expressed as a percentage of the original principal amount of the bonds to which the credit enhancement or liquidity agreement pertains, may not exceed the percentage set forth in paragraph (1) of subdivision (g) of Section 147 of Title 26 of the United States Code enacted as of January 1, 2003. (3) The amount appropriated pursuant to subdivision (a) for interest incurred in connection with any credit enhancement or liquidity agreement, when expressed as a percentage of the outstanding principal amount of the bonds to which the credit enhancement or liquidity agreement pertains, may not exceed the interest rate percentage set forth in subdivision (d) of Section 16731. (c) This section shall become operative June 30, 2013. SEC. 3. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to ensure that the state may meet its financial obligations and to enable the state to market debt issuances, thereby improving the state's fiscal status, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.