06/15/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/24/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/24/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5275.) | |||
05/06/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/05/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |||
04/20/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/06/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
04/05/2010 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/17/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |||
02/16/2010 | Read first time. To print. |