|
05/28/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 5337.) Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. To Conference Committee. (Ayes 6. Noes 52. Page 5337.) Joint Rules 28, 28.1, 29, 29.5(c) and 29.5(d) suspended in the Assembly. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 5348.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 6. Page 3624.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Ducheny.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 1227.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|