|
08/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 201, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:55 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6093.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4371.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5342.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|