|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4203.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5085.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|