|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 562, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6463.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6484.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4712.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4822.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|