|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 87, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4196.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 4854.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|