|
06/22/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 29, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5730.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3942.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Ducheny.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 1227.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|