LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1912
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1912
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1912
Compare Versions
AB1912 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1912 Enrolled August 19, 2010
AB1912 Amended August 2, 2010
AB1912 Amended July 1, 2010
AB1912 Amended June 10, 2010
AB1912 Amended April 8, 2010
AB1912 Amended April 7, 2010
AB1912 Amended April 5, 2010
AB1912 Introduced February 16, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1912 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1912 Enrolled August 19, 2010
AB1912 Amended August 2, 2010
AB1912 Amended July 1, 2010
AB1912 Amended June 10, 2010
AB1912 Amended April 8, 2010
AB1912 Amended April 7, 2010
AB1912 Amended April 5, 2010
AB1912 Introduced February 16, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare