06/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/20/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/20/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 25. Page 5248.) | |||
05/17/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/13/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 12). | |||
04/26/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 21). | |||
04/06/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |||
04/05/2010 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/17/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |||
02/16/2010 | Read first time. To print. |