LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1915
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1915
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1915
Action History
05/10/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/12/2010
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 12).
04/08/2010
Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
04/05/2010
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
03/04/2010
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
02/17/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
02/16/2010
Read first time. To print.