|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 5496.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 7).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|