California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1925 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2010

Amended

Bill August 2, 2010
Bill July 15, 2010
Bill May 28, 2010
Bill April 20, 2010