|
08/18/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 152, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4375.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4819.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|