|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 457, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6463.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6485.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4709.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 5455.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|