BILL NUMBER: AB 1931AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 24, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 28, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Torrico (Coauthors: Assembly Members Coto, Davis, Fletcher, and Jones) (Coauthors: Senators Florez and Wolk) FEBRUARY 17, 2010 An act to amend Sections 104336 and 104337 of, and to repeal Sections 104339.5 and 104339.6 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to injury prevention, and making an appropriation therefor.. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1931, as amended, Torrico. Injury prevention. Existing law, the Roman Reed Spinal Cord Injury Research Act of 1999, establishes the Spinal Cord Injury Research Fund, continuously appropriated to the University of California, for the purpose of awarding grants to perform spinal cord injury research projects. The fund consists of moneys from private entities, as specified, as well as public moneys transferred to the fund. Existing law, with the approval of the Regents of the University of California, also creates a Spinal Cord Injury Research Program in the University of California to promote spinal cord injury research in California. The program and the fund are repealed as of January 1, 2011. This bill wouldprovide that the fund would consist of moneys from private entities as well as local and federal moneys transferred to the fund and would expressly provide that these moneys may be expended solely for research programs and grants, as specified.eliminate the Spinal Cord Injury Research Fund, and instead, permit the University of California to establish a spinal cord injury research fund, independent of the State Treasury, to accept public and private funds for spinal cord injury research programs and grants, as prescribed . It would delete the repeal date of provisions relating to the Spinal Cord Research Programand the fund, thisthus indefinitely extending the duration of those provisions.The bill would clarify that it would not prohibit the University of California from administering an additional fund to accept public and private funds for the purpose of implementing the bill, as specified. By deleting the repeal date of a continuously appropriated fund this bill would make an appropriation.Vote:2/3majority . Appropriation:yesno . Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 104336 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:104336. (a) There is hereby established a Spinal Cord Injury Research Fund. Notwithstanding Section 13340 of the Government Code, the fund is continuously appropriated to the University of California for the purposes of this chapter. (b) The fund shall consist of money accepted by the University of California from grants and donations from private entities, as well as local and federal moneys transferred to the fund. Any state moneys transferred to the fund prior to January 1, 2011, shall remain available in the fund for expenditures pursuant to this chapter. (c) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, money remaining in the fund at the end of a fiscal year shall not revert to the General Fund. (d) Nothing in this section shall preclude the University of California from establishing and administering an additional fund,104336. The University of California may establish a spinal cord injury research fund, independent of the State Treasury, to accept public and private funds for the purpose of implementing this chapter. SEC. 2. Section 104337 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 104337. Moneys in the fund established pursuant to Section 104336 may be expended by the University of California solely for spinal cord injury research programs and grants, and may be expended for, but not limited to, costs for peer review and grant administration. SEC. 3. Section 104339.5 of the Health and Safety Code is repealed. SEC. 4. Section 104339.6 of the Health and Safety Code is repealed.