LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1933
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1933
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1933
Compare Versions
AB1933 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1933 Enrolled August 31, 2010
AB1933 Amended August 20, 2010
AB1933 Amended August 17, 2010
AB1933 Amended April 5, 2010
AB1933 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1933 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1933 Enrolled August 31, 2010
AB1933 Amended August 20, 2010
AB1933 Amended August 17, 2010
AB1933 Amended April 5, 2010
AB1933 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare