|
08/31/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Motion to pass temporarily. (Ayes 53. Noes 11. Page 6968.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 5109.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 20. Noes 16. Page 5033.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator DeSaulnier. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5033.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 5389.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|