California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1944 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2010

Amended

Bill July 1, 2010
Bill June 10, 2010
Bill May 3, 2010