|
06/30/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 5576.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|