|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6644.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6658.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 4839.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments. Ordered returned to Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Withdrawn from Enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6282.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4497.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4793.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|