LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1959
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1959
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1959
Action History
04/19/2010
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
04/12/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
03/04/2010
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
02/18/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
02/17/2010
Read first time. To print.