06/10/2010 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/07/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/03/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5556.) | |||
06/01/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/28/2010 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
04/21/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/25/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 24). | |||
03/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |||
02/18/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Read first time. To print. |