California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1962 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2010

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2010

Chaptered

Bill July 9, 2010

Amended

Bill June 9, 2010
Bill June 7, 2010
Bill May 27, 2010
Bill March 18, 2010