|
07/09/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:15 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4057.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5162.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|