05/26/2010 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
05/19/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |||
05/12/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/05/2010 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
05/04/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/03/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 20). | |||
04/06/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
02/18/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Read first time. To print. |