08/19/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
08/18/2010 | From inactive file. To second reading. | |||
08/20/2009 | To inactive file on motion of Senator Ducheny. | |||
06/11/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |||
05/14/2009 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/04/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/04/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 1229.) | |||
03/31/2009 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
02/03/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | |||
02/02/2009 | Read first time. To print. |