05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/28/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 13). | |||
04/06/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 8.) | |||
03/23/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
02/18/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Read first time. To print. |