|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. (Corrected June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 13. Page 5562.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 7). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 4931.). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. (Page 4931.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|