06/30/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |||
06/10/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
06/01/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/01/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 5425.) | |||
05/20/2010 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Ayes 45. Noes 26. Page 5244.). | |||
05/12/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/11/2010 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
05/10/2010 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (May 5). | |||
04/06/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/05/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/18/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Read first time. To print. |