|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 587, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 5021.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 5041.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|