05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/28/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/20/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/19/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/15/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 7). | |||
03/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/18/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Read first time. To print. |