BILL NUMBER: AB 1993AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 11, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 5, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 6, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Audra Strickland FEBRUARY 17, 2010 An act to add Section 7550.7 to the Government Code, relating to reports. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1993, as amended, Audra Strickland. Reports: declarations. Existing law sets out the requirements for the submission of written reports to the Legislature. This bill would require any entity submitting a written report to the Legislature, a Member of the Legislature, or a committee of the Legislature to include a signed statement by the head of the entity submitting the written report declaring that the factual contents of the written report are true, accurate, and complete to the best of his or her knowledge. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 7550.7 is added to the Government Code, to read: 7550.7. (a) (1) Notwithstanding any other law, any entity submitting a written report to the Legislature, a Member of the Legislature, or a committee of the Legislature shall include a signed statement by the head of the entity submitting the written report declaring that the factual contents of the written report are true, accurate, and complete to the best of his or her knowledge. (2) With respect to the Franchise Tax Board, the signed statement described in paragraph (1) shall be made by the executive officer of that board,andwith respect to the State Board of Equalization, the statement shall be made by the executive director of that board , and with respect to the Judicial Council, the statement shall be signed by the Administrative Director of the Courts . (b) Paragraph (1) of subdivision (a) shall apply to the head of every entity submitting a written report, including, but not limited to, elected officials of state government, and any state official whose duties are prescribed by the California Constitution. (c) For purposes of this section, a "written report" is either of the following: (1) A document required by statute to be prepared and submitted to the Legislature, a Member of the Legislature, or a committee of the Legislature. (2) A document, summary, or statement requested by a Member of the Legislature. (d) The declaration in the signed statement as to the truth, accuracy, and completeness of the factual contents of the written report shall not apply to any forecasts, predictions, recommendations, or opinions contained in the written report.