BILL NUMBER: AB 1995AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 24, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gaines FEBRUARY 17, 2010 An act to amend Section 1053 of, and to add Section 1053.1 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1995, as amended, Gaines. Licenses: Automated License Data System. Existing law generally prohibits a person from obtaining more than one license, permit, reservation, or other entitlement of the same class, or more than the number of tags authorized by statute or regulation for the same license year, but provides for multiple entitlements under specified circumstances, including a replacement in case of the loss or destruction of an unexpired entitlement as certified by the applicant's signed affidavit and proof, as determined by the department, that the original license, tag, permit, reservation, or other entitlement was issued, and payment of a base fee of $5, adjusted annually pursuant to a specified index. This bill would exempt entitlements issued through the Automated License Data System from those provisions, and, instead, for those entitlements, would generally prohibit a person from obtaining more than one entitlement of the same class, or more than the number of tags authorized by statute or regulation for the same license year, but would provide for multiple entitlements under specified circumstances, including the replacement of the entitlements in case of the loss or destruction of an unexpired entitlement as certified by the applicant's signed affidavit and proof, as determined by the department, that the original entitlement was issued, and payment of a $5 base fee of $9 , or in case of the loss or destruction of a stamp or endorsement imprinted on a base license and payment of a base fee of $3 for each stamp or endorsement replaced on any base license document. Those fees would be adjusted annually pursuant to the specified index , based on license years established in the bill, not to exceed the fee for the origi nal entitlement . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1053 of the Fish and Game Code is amended to read: 1053. (a) A person shall not obtain more than one license, permit, reservation, or other entitlement of the same class, or more than the number of tags authorized by statute or regulation for the same license year, except under one of the following conditions: (1) Nonresident hunting licenses issued pursuant to paragraphs (4) and (5) of subdivision (a) of Section 3031, and short-term sport fishing licenses issued pursuant to paragraphs (3), (4), and (5) of subdivision (a) of Section 7149, and paragraphs (3), (4), and (5) of subdivision (a) of Section 7149.05. (2) The loss or destruction of an unexpired license, tag, permit, reservation, or other entitlement as certified by the applicant's signed affidavit and proof, as determined by the department, that the original license, tag, permit, reservation, or other entitlement was issued, and payment of a base fee of five dollars ($5), adjusted pursuant to Section 713, not to exceed the fee for the original entitlement. (3) The adjustment of the base fee pursuant to Section 713 applies to the hunting license years commencing on or after July 1, 1996, and the fishing license years commencing on or after January 1, 1996. ($5). The base fee shall be adjusted annually pursuant to Section 713, not to exceed the fee for the original entitlement, as follows: (A) The adjustment shall apply to the hunting license years commencing on or after July 1, 1996. (B) The adjustment shall apply to the fishing license years commencing on or after January 1, 1996. (b) This section does not apply to licenses, permits, reservations, tags, or other entitlements issued through the Automated License Data System. SEC. 2. Section 1053.1 is added to the Fish and Game Code, to read: 1053.1. (a) A person shall not obtain more than one license, permit, reservation, or other entitlement of the same class, or more than the number of tags authorized by statute or regulation for the same license year, except under one of the following conditions: (1) Nonresident hunting licenses issued pursuant to paragraphs (4) and (5) of subdivision (a) of Section 3031, and short-term sport fishing licenses issued pursuant to paragraphs (3), (4), and (5) of subdivision (a) of Section 7149, and paragraphs (3), (4), and (5) of subdivision (a) of Section 7149.05. (2) The loss or destruction of an unexpired license, tag, permit, reservation, or other entitlement as certified by the applicant's signed affidavit and proof, as determined by the department, that the original license, tag, permit, reservation, or other entitlement was issued, and payment of a base fee of nine dollars ($9), adjusted pursuant to Section 713, not to exceed the fee for the original entitlement. five dollars ($5). The base fee shall be adjusted annually pursuant to Section 713, not to exceed the fee for the original entitlement, as follows: (A) The adjustment shall apply to the hunting license years commencing on or after July 1, 1996. (B) The adjustment shall apply to the fishing license years commencing on or after January 1, 1996. (3) The loss or destruction of a stamp or endorsement imprinted on a base license and payment of a base fee of three dollars ($3) for each stamp or endorsement replaced on any base license document, adjusted annually pursuant to Section 713, not to exceed the fee for the original entitlement. The base fee in this paragraph shall apply to the 2011 license year. (b) The base fees specified in this section are applicable to the 2011 license year, and shall be adjusted annually thereafter pursuant to Section 713. (c) (b) This section applies only to licenses, permits, reservations, tags, and other entitlements issued through the Automated License Data System.