California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1995 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 4, 2010

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2010

Amended

Bill June 15, 2010
Bill April 26, 2010
Bill March 24, 2010