LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1997
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1997
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1997
Compare Versions
AB1997 Enrolled September 1, 2010
AB1997 Amended June 30, 2010
AB1997 Amended June 16, 2010
AB1997 Amended March 17, 2010
AB1997 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB1997 Enrolled September 1, 2010
AB1997 Amended June 30, 2010
AB1997 Amended June 16, 2010
AB1997 Amended March 17, 2010
AB1997 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare