|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 402, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2662.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1843.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 978.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 3).
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & P.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|