|
08/27/2010
|
Joint Rules 61(b)(15) and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4959.) Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4960.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5053.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|