LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2001
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2001
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2001
Compare Versions
AB2001 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB2001 Enrolled August 16, 2010
AB2001 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2001 Amended May 3, 2010
AB2001 Amended April 5, 2010
AB2001 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2001 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB2001 Enrolled August 16, 2010
AB2001 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2001 Amended May 3, 2010
AB2001 Amended April 5, 2010
AB2001 Introduced February 17, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare