07/09/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 61, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/09/2010 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/30/2010 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:15 a.m. | |||
06/24/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/24/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4057.) | |||
06/21/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/17/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 16). | |||
04/29/2010 | Referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |||
04/15/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/15/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4688.) | |||
04/07/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 7). | |||
03/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
02/18/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2010 | Read first time. To print. |