LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2006
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2006
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2006
Action History
04/14/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
04/07/2010
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
04/06/2010
Read second time and amended.
04/05/2010
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 23).
03/04/2010
Referred to Com. on JUD.
02/18/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
02/17/2010
Read first time. To print.