|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6384.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4599.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to JR 61(b)(14).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5032.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|