|
09/23/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4797.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 15).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 5511.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|